THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:39:51 PM
Miladinovic, Ljiljana
CPSO#:
77299
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian
Education: University of Belgrade, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rosedale Medical Center
Suite 405
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 929-2173
Fax: (416) 929-4906
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LJILJANA MILADINOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILADINOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2002 to 20 Feb 2002
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 20 Feb 2002 to 05 Mar 2002
EL - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 06 Mar 2002 to 03 Apr 2002
EL - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 03 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2002 |