THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:25:00 PM
Kanjeekal, Santosh Samuel Rajh
CPSO#:
77291
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6435
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANTOSH SAMUEL RAJH KANJEEKAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANJEEKAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2002 to 10 Mar 2002
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Mar 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2003 |