THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:11:49 AM
Duke, Marin Jonina
CPSO#:
77278
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jan 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Manitoba, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 12
65 University Ave East
Waterloo ON N2J 2V9
Phone: (519) 746-2220
Fax: (519) 746-2295
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2002 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Executive Committee |
Effective: 15 Jan 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 16 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 20 Aug 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 20 Aug 2011 |
|
Active |