THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:21:17 PM
Manoharan, Sathiyapooma
CPSO#:
77259
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Dec 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Dec 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1-1939 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1P 2L9
Phone: 416 754 0003
Fax: 416 754 0005
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SATHIYAPOOMA MANOHARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOHARAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 07 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 May 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2004 |