THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 14:29:20 PM
Carter, Teresa Annunziata
CPSO#:
77255
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
31 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jan 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Teresa Carter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St W
Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 12 Jun 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Oct 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jan 2002 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Nov 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2017 |