THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:14:22 AM
Murtoza, Golam
CPSO#:
77249
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
27 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Mar 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
27-Aug-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English
Education: University of Dhaka, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. G. Murtoza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Mar 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2003 to 12 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2003 to 12 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2004 to 08 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 27 Aug 2020 |