THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:40:34 PM
Marszal, Maria Magdalena
CPSO#:
77236
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Feb 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Feb 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5A
609 William Street
Cobourg ON K9A 3A5
Phone: (905) 373-0728
Fax: (905) 373-1482
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Feb 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARIA MAGDALENA MARSZAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSZAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 07 Jan 2003 to 12 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2003 to 12 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jan 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2004 |