THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:47:45 AM
Al-Mohawes, Hanan Abdulrahman Mohammed
CPSO#:
77232
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Faisal University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON M4K 2P8
Phone: 416 461 9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANAN ABDULRAHMAN MOHAMMED AL-MOHAWES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-MOHAWES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 01 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 01 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 01 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2013 |