THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:31:14 PM
Eskandar, Sherif Nagui Fayek
CPSO#:
77223
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jan 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
13750 96 Ave
Surrey BC V3V 1Z2
Phone: (604) 581-2211
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Eskandar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 27 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre |
Barrie |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERIF NAGUI FAYEK ESKANDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESKANDAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 07 Jan 2003 to 06 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Jan 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2004 |