THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:07:08 AM
Mota, Jorge Antonio Rocha
CPSO#:
77221
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Apr 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Apr 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: University of Bahia, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesiology
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 271-2120 Ext. 2510
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:14 Dec 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 28 Sep 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2003 to 29 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Dec 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Dec 2001 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Mar 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Apr 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Apr 2010 |
|
Active |