THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:40:37 AM
Mak, Peter Ho Kwong
CPSO#:
77219
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Aug 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
3050 Lawrence Ave East
Toronto ON M1P 2V5
Phone: (416) 438-2911 Ext. 8133
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER HO KWONG MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2005 |