THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:20:31 AM
Shehata, Ramez Samir Hanna
CPSO#:
77210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 May 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Coronation Dental Specialty Group
17B-350 CONESTOGA BLV
Cambridge ON N1R 7L7
Phone: 18886233810
Fax: 5196231760
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Apr 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 14 Sep 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 2003 to 15 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 16 Mar 2004 to 30 Apr 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Apr 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
|
Active |