THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:11:51 PM
Shende, Vasanti Nitin
CPSO#:
77185
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Dec 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Pune, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4-44
125 Delhi Street
Guelph ON N1E 4J5
Phone: (519) 823-1730
Fax: (519) 823-9639
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 May 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:24 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VASANTI NITIN SHENDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENDE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 19 Dec 2002
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2002 |