THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 5:29:39 AM
Josephson, Timothy Blair
CPSO#:
77169
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:26 Aug 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY BLAIR JOSEPHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPHSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2001 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Feb 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2008 |