THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 2:33:35 AM
Smyth, Karl Richard
CPSO#:
77163
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Nov 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Nov 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4054
Fax: (613) 761-4476
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Smyth and Condon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KARL RICHARD SMYTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMYTH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2001 |