THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 10:21:35 AM
Fenech, Darlene Sherry
CPSO#:
77133
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Surgical Oncology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4027
Fax: (416) 480-6179
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DARLENE SHERRY FENECH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENECH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2001 to 13 Jan 2002
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2002 to 17 Nov 2002
EL - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Nov 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2005 |