THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:04:14 PM
Quayyum, Zahirul
CPSO#:
77126
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
01 Dec 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Oct 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
1-Dec-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Farsi, Hindi, Pashto, Persian, Urdu
Education: University of Dhaka, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Parveen-Quayyum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2015
Corporation Name: Dr. Parveen-Quayyum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2001 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2019 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 Dec 2019 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 01 Dec 2019 |