THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:36:57 PM
Dyub, Adel Mahmud Ali
CPSO#:
77121
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Oct 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
General Hospital
McMaster Clinic Room 504
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 44967
Fax: (905) 577-8228
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:11 Oct 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADEL MAHMUD ALI DYUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYUB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 11 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 12 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 11 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 12 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 11 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 12 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 11 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 12 Oct 2005 to 11 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 12 Oct 2006 to 11 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2007 |