THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:17:06 AM
Gupta, Vikas
CPSO#:
77101
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Sep 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Guru Nanak Dev University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Oncology
and Hematology
UHN - Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue Room 5-303C
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4521
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:29 Oct 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Oct 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Oct 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Oct 2020 |
|
Active |