THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:55:11 PM
Macdonald, David Blair
CPSO#:
77099
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
2nd Floor, CPCR L2119
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78571
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Almonte General Hospital |
Almonte |
Arnprior Regional Health |
Arnprior |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:24 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID BLAIR MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 31 Oct 2001
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2003 |