THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:36:59 AM
Duque-Rendon, Hector Alonso
CPSO#:
77084
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Antioquia, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 325
90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON N4N 1N1
Phone: (519) 364-0910
Fax: (519) 364-0920
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HECTOR ALONSO DUQUE-RENDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUQUE-RENDON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2001 to 30 Apr 2002
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 May 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Sep 2001 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Dec 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Nov 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Apr 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Feb 2007 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Mar 2008 |