THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 18:50:31 PM
Amlani, Shoaib
CPSO#:
77075
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Nov 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Nov 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East (N.2.918)
Brampton, Ontario
L6R 3J7
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 57586
Fax: (905) 494-6717
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Oct 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHOAIB AMLANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMLANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2001 to 19 Oct 2001
EL - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 2004 |