THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 18:28:33 PM
Duguay, Kirk John
CPSO#:
77059
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:18 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRK JOHN DUGUAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGUAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 19 Sep 2001 to 16 Oct 2001
EL - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Oct 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2013 |