THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:46:30 AM
Nandagopal, Narayanan
CPSO#:
77048
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Sep 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand Genesis Health
9080 Yonge Street
Level 2 - Unit 2
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
Phone: (905) 966-0102
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:02 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NARAYANAN NANDAGOPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANDAGOPAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Plastic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
CF - Plastic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2003 |