THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:40:40 AM
Al Shabanah, Hasan Abdulaziz H
CPSO#:
77045
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
479 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6M 1L9
Phone: 9052861134
Fax: 9052861135
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HASAN ABDULAZIZ H AL SHABANAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL SHABANAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2016 |