THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:29:21 AM
Villar, Giselle Christine Pawlowski
CPSO#:
77012
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Oct 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Oct 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Federal de Sao Paulo, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: 7789287531
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Giselle Villar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2008
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GISELLE CHRISTINE PAWLOWSKI VILLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILLAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
CF - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jun 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2023 |