THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:18:51 AM
Martinovic, Laurie Anne
CPSO#:
77011
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Aug 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Mar 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare Services
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 338-4146
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Mar 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURIE ANNE MARTINOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINOVIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2001 to 10 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2002 to 09 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2003 |