THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:36:42 AM
Marrin, Andrea Karen
CPSO#:
76994
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Sue-A-Quan, Andrea Karen (used until: 19 Jan 2005 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
201-271 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 7Z5
Phone: 9053372112
Fax: 2893513026
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:11 Sep 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA KAREN MARRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARRIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Aug 2001 to 23 Sep 2001
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2004 |