THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:48:03 AM
Wadhwa, Uttam Jit Kaur
CPSO#:
76987
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Feb 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Delhi, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: U. Wadhwa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 2 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:25 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2024 |