THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:58:42 PM
Doyle, Leilani Nanette
CPSO#:
76966
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Aug 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesia
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hopital Montfort |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEILANI NANETTE DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2001 |