THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 4:49:23 AM
Burhan, Amer Mohammed Abdul-Latif
CPSO#:
76957
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Aug 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Shores
700 Gordon St
Whitby ON L1N 5S9
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences |
Whitby |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:26 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMER MOHAMMED ABDUL-LATIF BURHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |