THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 19:24:02 PM
Bane, Anita Lorraine
CPSO#:
76954
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON N1R 7S6
Phone: 519-621-2330
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Anita Bane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 29 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:01 Jul 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Oct 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Oct 2015 |
|
Active |