THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:11:54 AM
Rehman, Mujeeb Ur
CPSO#:
76946
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Nov 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 416-747-3591 Ext. 32362
Fax: 416-747-3350
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site |
St Catharines |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Oct 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MUJEEB UR REHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REHMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Oct 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: January 5, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)