THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 20:25:35 PM
Muniz Rodriguez, Flor Maria
CPSO#:
76945
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Instituto Tecnologico De Santo Domingo, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:07 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FLOR MARIA MUNIZ RODRIGUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNIZ RODRIGUEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 14 Nov 2003
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Nov 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 2016 |