THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:41:25 AM
Duong, Mylinh
CPSO#:
76944
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
12 Jul 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Adelaide Faculty of Health, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Room A3 76
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521 2100 Ext. 43566
Fax: (905) 389-0108
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:12 Jul 2007 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Respiratory Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jul 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 03 Jun 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
|
Active |