THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:28:29 AM
Ghomeshi, Hooman Reza
CPSO#:
76932
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Spanish
Education: Queen's University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Ave
Cornwall ON K6H 5S5
Phone: (613) 938-4240
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Jul 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOOMAN REZA GHOMESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOMESHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
McMaster University, 05 Jan 2009 to 17 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Dec 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2009 |