THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 10:10:17 AM
Mahim, Ardavan
CPSO#:
76930
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: American University of the Caribbean, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4600
Fax: (705) 876-4601
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 May 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:12 Oct 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ARDAVAN MAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2003 |