THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:59:05 AM
Raphy, Pascale
CPSO#:
76920
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 May 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 2777
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PASCALE RAPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAPHY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2001 to 21 Sep 2001
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 08 Jul 2002 to 27 Sep 2002
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Sep 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2005 |