THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 21:58:18 PM
Platonov, Michael Alexander
CPSO#:
76917
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1000 Middlegate Road, Second floor
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Phone: (905) 804-7000
Fax: (905) 804-2250
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Oct 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALEXANDER PLATONOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLATONOV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2001 to 03 Sep 2001
EL - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Sep 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2009 |