THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 7:10:16 AM
Krishnan, Rajesh
CPSO#:
76911
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Tamil
Education: University of Madras, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Northumberland Hills Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: (905) 373-6933
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJESH KRISHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 19 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Oct 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2008 |