THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:41:42 PM
Cheema, Sohail Ehsan
CPSO#:
76906
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Nishtar Medical College, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Pediatric Ambulatory Clinic
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON M5C 2T2
Phone: (416) 867-3655
Fax: (416) 867-3736
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Jul 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 23 Jun 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2010 |
|
Active |