THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:33:12 PM
Noor, Mounir Habib Abdel
CPSO#:
76900
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Sep 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Jul 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Noor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 29 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should send their request to:
423 Wanless Road, Unit 105, Brampton, ON, L7A 0N9, Tel: (905) 495-9040, Fax: (905) 495-0439
Date Received: 14 Dec 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 16 Jul 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 31, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mounir Habib Abdel Noor to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 31, 2022:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Noor engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family medicine practice. In the face of this investigation, Dr. Noor resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)