THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:14:12 AM
Mustafa, Hassan A
CPSO#:
76894
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Al-Arab Medical University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
3001 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K2B 7Y6
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Nova Scotia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Jul 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:17 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HASSAN A MUSTAFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSTAFA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 29 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2003 to 29 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2004 to 29 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2005 to 29 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2007 to 28 Feb 2008
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2008 |