THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:17:17 PM
Gupta, Rajeev
CPSO#:
76886
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2250 Bovaird Dr East, Suite 613
Brampton ON L6R 0W3
Phone: 9057991398
Fax: 9057999099
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:03 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJEEV GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 31 Jan 2003
EL - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2004 |