THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 0:21:27 AM
Amhalhal, Ismeil Moammar Alkantari
CPSO#:
76871
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Al-Arab Medical University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON P7B5N3
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Lake of the Woods District Hospital |
Kenora |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital |
Sioux Lookout |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jul 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:21 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ISMEIL MOAMMAR ALKANTARI AMHALHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMHALHAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 25 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2003 to 29 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 29 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Aug 2015
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Dec 2006 |