THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:20:45 AM
Shimanovsky, Ludmila Alexeyevna
CPSO#:
76868
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 204
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 553-5400
Fax: (905) 553-5477
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUDMILA ALEXEYEVNA SHIMANOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIMANOVSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 22 Jul 2001 to 27 Aug 2001
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2002 to 03 Apr 2002
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Apr 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2002 |