THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:47:59 AM
Altaf, Fawaz Mohammed Nour Saeed
CPSO#:
76836
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:02 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Aug 2022 |