THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:18:27 AM
Savenkov, Oleg Anatolievich
CPSO#:
76830
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Novosibirsk Medical Institute, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Child and Youth Mental Health Prog
St Catharines Site
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON L2R 6P9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 46573
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:24 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLEG ANATOLIEVICH SAVENKOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVENKOV is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2010 |