THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:03:32 AM
Yousef, Osama Abdulhamid Emhemad
CPSO#:
76818
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
PO Box 9056
835 King Street
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 5144
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:07 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OSAMA ABDULHAMID EMHEMAD YOUSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSEF is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2009 |