THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:08:42 PM
Millar, Barbara-Ann McLellan
CPSO#:
76807
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sheffield University School of Medicine, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2936
Fax: (416) 946-2227
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:14 May 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARBARA-ANN MCLELLAN MILLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 2007 |